SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-7296 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-7296 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Frank C. Gonzalez, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:
March 7, 2022
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of California
Case Numbers:
(S163643)
Decision Date:
December 2, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 6, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 06 2022
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed.
Main Document
Apr 21 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Glen Niemy
Counsel of Record
11 Prescott Street, #2
Salem, MA 01970
gniemy@yahoo.com
2076999713
Party name: Frank Gonzalez
Attorneys for Respondent
Eric J. Kohm
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
300 South Spring Street
Suite 1702
Los Angeles, CA 90013
eric.kohm@doj.ca.gov
2132696089
Party name: State of California
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##