SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-7224 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-7224 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Johnathan I. Alcegaire, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
February 28, 2022
Linked with 21A320
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC19-428)
Decision Date:
September 9, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
October 27, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 10 2022
Application (21A320) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 25, 2022 to March 26, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jan 14 2022
Application (21A320) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 24, 2022.
Feb 23 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 30, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Mar 29 2022
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 12 2022
Reply of petitioner Johnathan Alcegaire filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 12 2022
Notice of substitution as counsel of record submitted by counsel for petitioner.
Main Document
Apr 14 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 02 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alice Beth Copek
Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel - North
1004 Desoto Park Drive
Tallahassee, FL 32301
alice.copek@ccrc-north.org
8504455716
Party name: Johnathan Alcegaire
David Dixon Hendry
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel- Middle Region
12973 N. Telecom Parkway
Temple Terrace, FL 33637
hendry@ccmr.state.fl.us
8135581600
Party name: Johnathan Alcegaire
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##