Docket for 21-7186 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 03 2021 | Application (21A213) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 20, 2021 to February 18, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions | Dec 09 2021 | Application (21A213) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until February 18, 2022. | | | Feb 18 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 25, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendix | Mar 24 2022 | Brief of respondent Tony Mays, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 05 2022 | Reply of petitioner Jon Hall filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Apr 07 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022. | | | Apr 25 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|