SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-7109 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-7109 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Jamie Mills, Petitioner
v.
John Q. Hamm, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections
Docketed:
February 14, 2022
Linked with 21A221
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(21-11534)
Decision Date:
August 12, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
October 6, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 10 2021
Application (21A221) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 4, 2022 to March 5, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Dec 14 2021
Application (21A221) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 3, 2022.
Feb 03 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 16, 2022)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Mar 09 2022
Brief of respondent John Q. Hamm in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 24 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 18 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Angela Leigh Setzer
Counsel of Record
122 Commerce Street
Montgomery, AL 36104
asetzer@eji.org
334-269-1803
Party name: Jamie Mills
Attorneys for Respondent
Lauren Ashley Simpson
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General State of Alabama
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130
lauren.simpson@alabamaag.gov
3343531209
Party name: John Q. Hamm
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##