Docket for 21-7082 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 10 2021 | Application (21A154) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 8, 2021 to February 4, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Nov 18 2021 | Application (21A154) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 4, 2022. | | | Feb 04 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 11, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 17 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2022 to April 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 18 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 11, 2022. | | | Mar 28 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 11, 2022 to May 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 29 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 11, 2022. | | | May 11 2022 | Brief of respondent Bobby Lumpkin in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 25 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022. | | | May 25 2022 | Reply of petitioner William Speer filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 06 2022 | Supplemental brief of respondent Bobby Lumpkin filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 13 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|