Docket for 21-7061 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 19 2021 | Application (21A185) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 29, 2021 to January 28, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions | Nov 30 2021 | Application (21A185) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 28, 2022. | | | Jan 28 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 7, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 15 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 7, 2022 to April 21, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 16 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 21, 2022. | | | Apr 01 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 21, 2022 to May 5, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 04 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 5, 2022. | | | May 05 2022 | Brief of respondent Bobby Lumpkin, Dir., TX DCJ in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 25 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022. | | | Jun 01 2022 | Motion to defer consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari pending further briefing filed by petitioner. | | Main Document | Jun 13 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|