Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-705
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-705
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Ted Roosevelt Yargee
Docketed:November 15, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2019-392)
   Decision Date:June 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2021Brief of respondent Ted R. Yargee in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Ted R. Yargee.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Muscogee (Creek) Nation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 12 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Adam Shaddox Barnett
    Counsel of Record
Tulsa County Public Defender
500 W. Archer St.
Tulsa, OK 74103

adam.barnett@oscn.net
9185965948
Party name: Ted R. Yargee
Other
Riyaz Amir Kanji
    Counsel of Record
Kanji & Kantzen, PLLC
303 Detroit Street
Suite 400
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

rkanji@kanjikatzen.com
734-769-5400
Party name: Muscogee (Creek) Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543