Docket for 21-7039 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 02 2021 | Application (21A134) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 29, 2021 to January 28, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Nov 05 2021 | Application (21A134) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until January 28, 2022. | | | Jan 28 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 3, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 14 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 3, 2022 to May 2, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 16 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2022. | | | Mar 31 2022 | Brief of respondent Dexter Payne in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 14 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022. | | | Apr 20 2022 | Reply of petitioner Andrew Sasser filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 29 2022 | Rescheduled. | | | May 09 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022. | | | May 11 2022 | Rescheduled. | | | May 16 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022. | | | May 23 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|