Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-679 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-679 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Tim Shoop, Warden, Petitioner
v.
August Cassano
Docketed:November 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3761)
   Decision Date:June 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 26, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2021Brief of respondent August Cassano in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 08 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent August Cassano.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 15 2021Reply of petitioner Tim Shoop filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 05 2022Record Requested.
Jan 06 2022Record received from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit. The record is electronic and available on PACER.
Feb 11 2022Record received from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio (4 boxes).
Feb 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Feb 22 2022Rescheduled.
Mar 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 16 2022Rescheduled.
Mar 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 23 2022Rescheduled.
Mar 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Mar 30 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 12 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 20 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
Apr 27 2022Rescheduled.
May 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 10 2022Rescheduled.
May 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.
May 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
Jun 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jun 21 2022Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, with whom Justice Alito joins, dissenting from denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)
Jun 21 2022Record returned to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio (4 boxes).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Tim Shoop
Attorneys for Respondent
Erin Gallagher Barnhart
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender for the Southern District of Ohio, Capital Habeas Unit
10 W. Broad St.
Ste. 1020
Columbus, OH 43215

erin_barnhart@fd.org
6144694125
Party name: August Cassano

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543