Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6680 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6680 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Jemaine Monteil Cannon, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:December 20, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PCD-2020-620)
   Decision Date:September 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 19, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 28 2022Reply of petitioner Jemaine M. Cannon filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Emma Victoria Rolls
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
215 Dean A. McGee Ave.
Suite 707
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

emma_rolls@fd.org
405-609-5975
Party name: Jemaine M. Cannon
Attorneys for Respondent
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543