SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-6674 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-6674 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Paul David Storey, Petitioner
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:
December 21, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(20-70014, 20-70016, 20-70017, 20-10805)
Decision Date:
August 6, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
September 21, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 16 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 20, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 20, 2022 to February 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 19 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 18, 2022.
Jan 28 2022
Brief of respondent Bobby Lumpkin in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Feb 11 2022
Reply of petitioner Paul Storey filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Feb 17 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Jun 29 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022
Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Sotomayor respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached
Opinion
)
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Logan Ware
Counsel of Record
Michael Logan Ware Attorney at Law
300 Burnett St.
Suite 160
Ft Worth, TX 76102
ware@mikewarelaw.com
8173384100
Party name: Paul Storey
Attorneys for Respondent
Travis Golden Bragg
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Texas
Post Office Box 12548
Capital Station
Austin, TX 78711-2548
travis.bragg@oag.texas.gov
5129631400
Party name: Bobby Lumpkin
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##