Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6650
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6650
Title:Zachary Jeff Harvell, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:December 17, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2021-1038)
   Decision Date:October 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 18, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Feb 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Zachary Harvell571262
PO Box 548
Lexington, OK 73051

Party name: Zachary Jeff Harvell

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543