SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-6593 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-6593 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Murray Hooper, Petitioner
v.
David Shinn, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections, Rehabilitation and Reentry
Docketed:
December 15, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(08-99024)
Decision Date:
January 8, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
July 15, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 10 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 14, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jan 04 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 14, 2022 to February 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 05 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 14, 2022.
Feb 14 2022
Brief of respondent David Shinn in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 03 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 15 2022
Reply of petitioner Murray Hooper filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 21 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jean-Claude Andre
Counsel of Record
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
120 Broadway, Suite 300
Santa Monica, CA 90401-2386
jcandre@bclplaw.com
3105762148
Party name: Murray Hooper
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey Lee Sparks
Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004
jeffrey.sparks@azag.gov
602 542-8583
Party name: David Shinn
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##