Docket for 21-6434 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 28 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 29, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jan 14 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 29, 2021 to February 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 18 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 28, 2022. | | | Feb 28 2022 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther | Mar 07 2022 | Reply of petitioner Robert Alan Fratta filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 17 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022. | | | Apr 04 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | | Apr 21 2022 | Petition for Rehearing filed. | | Main Document | Aug 18 2022 | DISTRIBUTED. | | | Sep 09 2022 | Rehearing DENIED. | | |
|