SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-6382 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-6382 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Askia Mustafa Raheem, Petitioner
v.
Benjamin Ford, Warden
Docketed:
November 23, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(16-12866)
Decision Date:
April 26, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
June 22, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 19 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 23, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 10 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 23, 2021 to February 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 13 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 1, 2022.
Feb 01 2022
Brief of respondent Benjamin Ford, Warden in opposition filed.
Main Document
Feb 15 2022
Reply of petitioner Askia Raheem filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Feb 17 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Mar 07 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Evan Olive
Counsel of Record
Law Office of Mark E. Olive, P.A.
320 West Jefferson Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Meolive@aol.com
850-212-7276
Party name: Askia Raheem
Attorneys for Respondent
Sabrina D. Graham
Counsel of Record
Senior Assistant Attorney General
40 Capitol Sq., SW
Atlanta, GA 30334
sgraham@law.ga.gov
404-458-3239
Party name: Benjamin Ford, Warden
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##