Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6311
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6311
Title:Curtis R. Gaylord, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:November 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1957)
   Decision Date:February 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 22, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 18 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 17, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 16 2021Waiver of right of respondent McDonough, Denis R. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022Petition DENIED.
Feb 14 2022Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentOther
Apr 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Curtis R. Gaylord103 S. May Street
Joliet, IL 60436

773-512-7909
Party name: Curtis R. Gaylord
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: McDonough, Denis R.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543