Docket for 21-6073 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Oct 18 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 26, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Nov 19 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 26, 2021 to December 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 22 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 27, 2021. See Rule 30.1. | | | Dec 20 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 27, 2021 to January 26, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 21 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 26, 2022. | | | Jan 26 2022 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 09 2022 | Reply of John Ray Falk submitted. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 10 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022. | | | Feb 28 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|