SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-6065 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-6065 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Michael Belcher, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:
October 26, 2021
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
Case Numbers:
(CR-18-0740)
Decision Date:
December 16, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
February 26, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
May 21, 2021
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 18 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 26, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Nov 22 2021
Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Dec 09 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alicia A. D'Addario
Counsel of Record
122 Commerce Street
Montgomery, AL 36104
adaddario@eji.org
334-269-1803
Party name: Michael Belcher
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Dearman Anderson
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Alabama
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130
richard.anderson@alabamaag.gov
3343532021
Party name: State of Alabama
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##