Docket for 21-5991 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Oct 14 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 17, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Nov 09 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 17, 2021 to December 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 10 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 17, 2021. | | | Dec 02 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 17, 2021 to January 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 03 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 14, 2022. | | | Dec 28 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 14, 2022 to February 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 29 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 14, 2022. | | | Feb 14 2022 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 03 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022. | | | Mar 03 2022 | Reply of petitioner Ricky Fackrell filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 21 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|