SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-5900 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-5900 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Justin Anderson, Petitioner
v.
Arkansas
Docketed:
October 5, 2021
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Arkansas
Case Numbers:
(CR-06-29)
Decision Date:
March 11, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
May 6, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 4, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Nov 04 2021
Brief of respondent Arkansas in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 19 2021
Reply of petitioner Justin Anderson filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 24 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Dec 13 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Charles Williams
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
1401 West Capitol, Suite 490
Little Rock, AR 72201
john_c_williams@fd.org
501.324.6132
Party name: Justin Anderson
Attorneys for Respondent
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201
nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: State of Arkansas
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##