SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-5860 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-5860 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Antonio Franklin, Petitioner
v.
Tim Shoop, Warden
Docketed:
October 5, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(20-3943)
Decision Date:
March 30, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 29 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 4, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Oct 18 2021
Brief of respondent Tim Shoop in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 01 2021
Reply of petitioner Antonio Franklin filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 03 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021.
Nov 22 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Antonio S. Franklin
363-374
PO Box 5500
Chillicothe, OH 45601
Party name: Antonio Franklin
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin Michael Flowers
Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215
benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Tim Shoop
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##