Docket for 21-579 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Oct 18 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 19, 2021) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 12 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 19, 2021 to December 20, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 15 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 20, 2021. | | | Dec 14 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 20, 2021 to January 3, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 16 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 3, 2022. | | | Dec 30 2021 | Brief of respondent Commissioner, Ala. Dept of Corrections in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 12 2022 | Reply of petitioner Kenneth Smith filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 19 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022. | | | Feb 22 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|