Docket for 21-5778 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 21 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 25, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Oct 25 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2021 to November 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 26 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2021. | | | Nov 16 2021 | Brief of respondent Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | Nov 29 2021 | Reply of petitioner Jeffrey Glenn Hutchinson filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 02 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022. | | | Jan 10 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|