SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-5753 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-5753 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
James Allyson Lee, Petitioner
v.
Benjamin Ford, Warden
Docketed:
September 22, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(19-11466)
Decision Date:
February 11, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
April 19, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 22, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Proof of Service
Oct 22 2021
Brief of respondent Benjamin Ford in opposition filed.
Main Document
Nov 09 2021
Reply of petitioner James Lee filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 10 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Dec 06 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marcia A. Widder
Counsel of Record
Georgia Resource Center
104 Marietta Street NW
Suite 260
Atlanta, GA 30303
marcy.widder@garesource.org
(404) 222-9202
Party name: James Lee
Attorneys for Respondent
Sabrina D. Graham
Counsel of Record
Senior Assistant Attorney General
40 Capitol Sq., SW
Atlanta, GA 30334
sgraham@law.ga.gov
404-458-3239
Party name: Benjamin Ford
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##