SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-569
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-569
Title:
Gregory V. Tucker, Petitioner
v.
City of Shreveport, Louisiana, et al.
Docketed:
October 19, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(19-30247)
Decision Date:
May 18, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 15 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Nov 03 2021
Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Gregory Tucker
Blanket Consent
Nov 04 2021
Waiver of right of respondent City of Shreveport, Louisiana, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 09 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Nov 18 2021
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Cato Institute. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Dec 06 2021
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Cato Institute GRANTED.
Dec 06 2021
Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Sotomayor, respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached
Opinion
)
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mary Lucia Blacksher Ranier
Counsel of Record
Tulane Law School Civil Rights and Federal Practice Clinic
6329 Freret Street
New Orleans, LA 70118
lblacksh@tulane.edu
5048628892
Party name: Gregory Tucker
Attorneys for Respondents
Nichole Marie Buckle
Counsel of Record
Carmouche, Bokenfohr, Buckle & Day, PLLC
6425 Youree Drive
Suite 380
Shreveport, LA 71105
nikki@cbbd.law
3186290014
Party name: City of Shreveport, Louisiana, et al.
Other
Jay Remington Schweikert
Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001
jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##