Docket for 21-5515 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 24 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 29, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetition | Oct 19 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 29, 2021 to November 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 19 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 18, 2021. | | | Nov 02 2021 | Brief of respondent Pennsylvania in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 17 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021. | | | Dec 06 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|