Docket for 21-5460 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 12 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 23, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Sep 09 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 23, 2021 to October 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 09 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2021. | | | Oct 15 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2021 to November 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 18 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is further extended to and including November 9, 2021. | | | Nov 09 2021 | Brief of respondent Bobby Lumpkin, Director in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 24 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021. | | | Nov 30 2021 | Reply of petitioner Joe Michael Luna filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentOther | Dec 13 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|