Docket for 21-5327 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 02 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 8, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Sep 02 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 8, 2021 to October 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 03 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 8, 2021. | | | Sep 22 2021 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Oct 05 2021 | Reply of petitioner Mark Anthony Gonzalez filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 07 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021. | | | Nov 01 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|