SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-5232 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-5232 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Duane Allen Short, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:
July 29, 2021
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Ohio, Montgomery County
Case Numbers:
(28696)
Decision Date:
October 23, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
March 2, 2021
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 27 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 30, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Aug 30 2021
Brief of respondent Ohio in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Sep 16 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erika Marie LaHote
Counsel of Record
Office of the Ohio Public Defender
250 East Broad Street, Suite 1400
Columbus, OH 43215
erika.lahote@opd.ohio.gov
614-466-5394
Party name: Duane Short
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew Thomas French
Counsel of Record
Montgomery County Prosecutor's Office
P.O. Box 972, 301 West Third Street
Dayton, OH 45422
frencha@mcohio.org
9372255775
Party name: State of Ohio
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##