SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-5094 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-5094 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Stanley Jalowiec, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:
July 13, 2021
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Ohio, Lorain County
Case Numbers:
(19CA011548)
Decision Date:
August 24, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
December 29, 2020
Date
Proceedings and Orders
May 27 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 12, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Aug 05 2021
Brief of respondent State of Ohio in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 17 2021
Reply of petitioner Stanley Jalowiec filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 19 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard A. Cline
Counsel of Record
Ohio Public Defender
250 E. Broad Street
Suite 1400
Columbus, OH 43215
richard.cline@opd.ohio.gov
614-466-5394
Party name: Stanley Jalowiec
Attorneys for Respondent
Lindsey Colleen Poprocki
Counsel of Record
Lorain County Prosecutor's Office
225 Court Street, Third Floor
Elyria, OH 44035
lindsey.poprocki@lcprosecutor.org
440-329-5389
Party name: State of Ohio
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##