Docket for 21-475
|
Sep 24 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 16 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021. | | | Nov 30 2021 | Response Requested. (Due December 30, 2021) | | | Dec 14 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 30, 2021 to January 29, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 16 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 31, 2022. See Rule 30.1. | | | Jan 24 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 31, 2022 to February 21, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 25 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 22, 2022. See Rule 30.1. | | | Feb 22 2022 | Brief of respondent Kenneth Smith in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 09 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022. | | | Mar 09 2022 | Reply of petitioner Deanna Brookhart filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 28 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|