Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-465
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-465
Title:James L. Kisor, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:September 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-1929)
   Decision Date:April 30, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 30, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 24 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2021 to November 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 29, 2021.
Nov 29 2021Brief of respondent Denis McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: James L. Kisor
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Denis McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543