Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-442 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-442 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Rodney Reed, Petitioner
v.
Bryan Goertz
Docketed:September 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-70022)
   Decision Date:April 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2021 to November 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2021. See Rule 30.1
Oct 22 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Constitutional Accountability Center.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Texas Exonerees Michael Morton and Anthony Graves, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 22, 2021 to January 5, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 5, 2022.
Dec 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 5, 2022 to January 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 19, 2022.
Jan 19 2022Brief of respondents Bryan Goertz, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 01 2022Reply of petitioner Rodney Reed filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022.
Feb 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Mar 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Apr 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Constitutional Accountability Center GRANTED.
Apr 25 2022Petition GRANTED.
May 02 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 1, 2022. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 23, 2022.
Jun 14 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, October, 11, 2022.
Jun 22 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Rodney Reed
Blanket Consent
Jun 22 2022Record requested from the 5th Circuit.
Jun 22 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Jun 24 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Bryan Goertz, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 01 2022Brief of petitioner Rodney Reed filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 01 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Eight Retired Judges filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Fred Smith Jr. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2022Brief amici curiae of The Law Enforcement Action Partnership and the National Police Accountability Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2022Brief amici curiae of Texas Exonerees Michael Morton and Anthony Graves, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2022Brief amici curiae of Federal Courts Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2022Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of Chase Baumgartner filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2022CIRCULATED
Aug 03 2022USDC, W. Dist., Tex. record on appeal, including sealed filings, has been electronically received by the Clerk.
Aug 23 2022Brief of respondent Bryan Goertz filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2022Brief amici curiae of Montana, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2022Reply of petitioner Rodney Reed filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2022Argued. For petitioner: Parker Rider-Longmaid, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Judd E. Stone, II, Solicitor General, Austin, Tex.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

priderlo@skadden.com
202-371-7000
Party name: Rodney Reed
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Bryan Goertz
Other
James Patrick Davy
    Counsel of Record
All Rise Trial & Appellate
P.O. Box 15216
Philadelphia, PA 19125

jimdavy@allriselaw.org
(215) 792-3579
Party name: The Law Enforcement Action Partnership and the National Police Accountability Project
David Morgan Steven Dewhirst
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Solicitor General
P.O. Box 201401
215 North Sanders
Helena, MT 59620-1401

David.Dewhirst@mt.gov
406-444-2026
Party name: State of Montana
Gregory Jacob Dubinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

gdubinsky@hsgllp.com
(646) 837-5151
Party name: Professor Fred Smith Jr.
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: Eight Retired Judges
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Sean M. SeLegue
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
Three Embarcadero Center, 10th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

sean.selegue@arnoldporter.com
415-471-3169
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al.
Samuel Spital
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector St.
Fifth Floor
New York, NY 10006

sspital@naacpldf.org
212-965-2205
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Craig E. Stewart
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
555 California Street
Floor 26
San Francisco, CA 94104

cestewart@jonesday.com
(415) 875-5714
Party name: Texas Exonerees Michael Morton and Anthony Graves, the Innocence Network, and The Constitution Project at the Project on Government Oversight
Meaghan Elizabeth McLaine VerGow
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mvergow@omm.com
(202)-383-5300
Party name: Federal Courts Scholars
Michael Logan Ware
    Counsel of Record
Innocence Project of Texas
300 Burnett Street
Suite 160
Fort Worth, TX 76102

ware@mikewarelaw.com
8173384100
Party name: Chase Baumgartner

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543