SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-290
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-290
Title:
Joseph Chapo, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jefferson County Plan Commission
Docketed:
August 27, 2021
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Indiana
Case Numbers:
(20A-CT-1197)
Decision Date:
January 22, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
May 27, 2021
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 25 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 27, 2021)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 24 2021
Brief of respondent Jefferson County Plan Commission in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Other
Oct 06 2021
Reply of petitioners Joseph Chapo, Sherry Chapo, Deputy Big Shot LLC filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Oct 13 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Charles E. McFarland
Counsel of Record
338 Jackson Road
New Castle, KY 40050
mcfarlandc@bellsouth.net
(502) 845-2754
Party name: Joseph Chapo, Sherry Chapo, Deputy Big Shot LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert Patrick Magrath
Counsel of Record
Alcorn Sage Schwartz & Magrath
1 W Sixth Street
Madison, IN 47250
magrath@advocatelawoffices.com
8122735230
Party name: Jefferson County Plan Commission
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##