Docket for 21-267 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 20 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 23, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 13 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 23, 2021 to October 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 14 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2021. | | | Sep 23 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 13 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2021 to November 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 14 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is further extended to and including November 9, 2021. | | | Nov 09 2021 | Brief of respondent Bobby Lumpkin, Director in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 23 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021. | | | Nov 23 2021 | Reply of petitioner James Garfield Broadnax filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Dec 06 2021 | Record Requested. | | | Dec 07 2021 | Record received from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. The record is available on PACER. | | | Dec 16 2021 | Record received from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas. The record is electronic and contains sealed materials. | | | Dec 29 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022. | | | Jan 18 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|