Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-245
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-245
Title:Pyrotechnic Specialties, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Lloyd J. Austin, III, Secretary of Defense
Docketed:August 20, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-2024)
   Decision Date:February 4, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 18 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 20, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2021Waiver of right of respondent Austin, Sec. of Defense to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Devlin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper, Barton, & Cooper, LLP
170 College Street
Macon, GA 31201

mdc@cooperbarton.com
478.841.9007
Party name: Pyrotechnic Specialties, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Austin, Sec. of Defense

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543