Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-219
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-219
Title:Clear Channel Outdoor, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Henry J. Raymond, Director, Department of Finance of Baltimore City
Docketed:August 16, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Maryland
   Case Numbers:(9, September Term, 2020)
   Decision Date:March 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Clear Channel Outdoor, LLC
Blanket Consent
Sep 15 2021Brief of respondent Henry J. Raymond in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 15 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Out of Home Advertising Association of America.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2021Response to motion from respondent Henry J. Raymond filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Sep 28 2021Reply of petitioner Clear Channel Outdoor, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Clear Channel Outdoor, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Patrick Redmond
    Counsel of Record
Baltimore City Law Department
100 N. Holiday St.
Baltimore, MD 21202

michael.redmond@baltimorecity.gov
4103967536
Party name: Henry J. Raymond
Other
Keith Bradley
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (U.S.) LLP
1801 California Street, Suite 4900
Denver, CO 80202

keith.bradley@squirepb.com
303-830-1776
Party name: Out of Home Advertising Association of America
Derek L. Shaffer
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
1300 I Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

derekshaffer@quinnemanuel.com
(202) 538-8000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543