Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-147
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-147
Title:Erik Egbert, Petitioner
v.
Robert Boule
Docketed:August 3, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-35789)
   Decision Date:May 20, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 30 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 2, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 2, 2021 to October 4, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 4, 2021.
Aug 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of Independent Women's Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Border Patrol Council filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2021Motion for leave to file a brief in opposition under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by respondent Robert Boule.
Oct 04 2021Brief of respondent Robert Boule in opposition filed.
Main Document
Oct 12 2021Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Oct 12 2021Reply of petitioner Erik Egbert filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/5/2021.
Nov 05 2021Motion for leave to file a brief in opposition under seal with redacted copies for the public record GRANTED.
Nov 05 2021Petition GRANTED limited to Questions 1 and 2 presented by the petition.
Dec 17 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, March 2, 2022.
Dec 20 2021Brief of petitioner Erik Egbert filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Motion of respondent for leave to file the joint appendix under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed.
Main Document
Dec 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Border Patrol Council filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Jennifer L. Mascott filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Independent Women's Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Dee Farmer, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Former U.S. Attorneys General John D. Ashcroft, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of National ICE Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Motion of respondent for leave to file the joint appendix under seal with redacted copies for the public record GRANTED.
Jan 18 2022Joint appendix redacted volume for the public record (file date of December 20, 2021). Note: revised redacted volume filed February 18, 2022.
Main DocumentMain Document
Jan 18 2022CIRCULATED
Jan 18 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 19 2022Motion to file respondent's brief on the merits under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 34 Media Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jan 26 2022Brief amici curiae of The DKT Liberty Project, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Project for Privacy & Surveillance Accountability and Protect the First Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Police Accountability Project filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Roy Sargeant filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Council on American-Islamic Relations and Anas Elhady filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights in Education filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2022Motion to file respondent's brief on the merits under seal with redacted copies for the public record GRANTED.
Feb 18 2022Redacted brief of respondent Robert Boule (filed 1/19/22). (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 18 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Feb 18 2022Reply of petitioner Erik Egbert filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2022Joint motion of the parties and the Solicitor General for leave to file a revised redacted joint appendix for the public record filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 25 2022Joint motion of the parties and the Solicitor General for leave to file a revised redacted joint appendix for the public record GRANTED.
Feb 25 2022Joint appendix revised redacted volume for the public record (filed 2/18/22). (Distributed)
Main Document
Mar 02 2022Argued. For petitioner: Sarah M. Harris, Washington, D. C.; and Michael R. Huston, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Felicia H. Ellsworth, Boston, Mass.
Jun 08 2022Judgment REVERSED. Thomas, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Alito, Kavanaugh, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Gorsuch, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment. Sotomayor, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment in part and dissenting in part, in which Breyer and Kagan, JJ., joined.
Jul 11 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarah Michelle Harris
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

sharris@wc.com
202-434-5599
Party name: Erik Egbert
Attorneys for Respondent
Felicia H. Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

felicia.ellsworth@wilmerhale.com
617-526-6687
Party name: Robert Boule
Other
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: National Police Accountability Project
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of Press
1156 15th Street NW
Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bbrown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 34 Media Organizations
Jim Ernest Calle
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Jim E. Calle
2185 W Magee Road
Suite 125
Tucson, AZ 85742

jimcalle@mac.com
5202750199
Party name: National Border Patrol Council
Steven Andrew Engel
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

steven.engel@dechert.com
(202) 261-3300
Party name: Former U.S. Attorneys General John D. Ashcroft, William P. Barr, Alberto R. Gonzales, Edwin Meese III, Michael B. Mukasey, and Jefferson B. Sessions III
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Patrick Michael Jaicomo
    Counsel of Record
901 North Glebe Road
Arlington, VA 22203

pjaicomo@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7726
Party name: The DKT Liberty Project, et al.
Lena Fatina Masri
    Counsel of Record
CAIR Legal Defense Fund
453 New Jersey Ave SE
Washington, D.C., DC 20003

ldf@cair.com
2027426420
Party name: Council on American-Islamic Relations and Anas Elhady
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 2062
Arlington, VA 22202

john@johnmasslon.com
(703) 791-9483
Party name: Independent Women's Law Center
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Separation of Powers Clinic, Gray Center for the Study of the Administrative State
Antonin Scalia Law School, George Mason University
3301 Fairfax Drive
Arlington, VA 22201

rmccotte@gmu.edu
202-706-5488
Party name: Professor Jennifer L. Mascott
Michael Alan Morguess
    Counsel of Record
Rains Lucia Stern St. Phalle & Silver, PC
2300 Contra Costa Boulevard
Suite 500
Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

mmorguess@rlslawyers.com
(925) 609-1699
Party name: National ICE Council
Elizabeth B. PrelogarSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Project for Privacy & Surveillance Accountability and Protect the First Foundation
Darpana M. Sheth
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights in Education
510 Walnut St.
Suite 1250
Philadelphia, PA 19106

darpana.sheth@thefire.org
2157173473
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights in Education
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

andrew.tutt@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: Roy Sargeant
Cecillia Derphine Wang
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
39 Drumm Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

cwang@aclu.org
415-343-0775
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Washington, Cato Institute, Roderick & Solange Macarthur Justice Center, National Immigration Litigation Alliance, and Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
David Meir Zionts
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burlington LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

dzionts@cov.com
202 662 5987
Party name: Dee Farmer, Marcellas Hoffman, Chrissy Shorter, and Donald Snowden

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543