Feb 11 2022 | Application (21A422) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 2, 2022 to May 1, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service |
Feb 16 2022 | Application (21A422) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 1, 2022. |
| |
Mar 16 2022 | Application (21A422) to extend further the time from April 1, 2022 to April 29, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
| Written RequestProof of Service |
Mar 18 2022 | Application (21A422) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 29, 2022. |
| |
Apr 29 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 2, 2022) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
May 25 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 2, 2022 to July 5, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
May 26 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2022. |
| |
Jun 02 2022 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Exonerees. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Jun 28 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 5, 2022 to August 4, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jun 29 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 4, 2022. |
| |
Aug 04 2022 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Aug 23 2022 | Reply of petitioner James Milton Dailey filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Aug 24 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. |
| |
Oct 03 2022 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Exonerees GRANTED. |
| |
Oct 03 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
| |