Docket for 21-1357 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Feb 01 2022 | Application (21A391) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 15, 2022 to April 16, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions | Feb 03 2022 | Application (21A391) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 16, 2022. | | | Mar 29 2022 | Application of James Tyler for a further extension of time not accepted for filing. (March 31, 2022) | | | Apr 14 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 04 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2022 to June 17, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 05 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 17, 2022. | | | May 18 2022 | Amicus brief of Louisiana Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers not accepted for filing.(Corrected version to be submitted) (May 20, 2022) | | | May 18 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Louisiana Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers (5/20/2022) filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 17 2022 | Brief of respondent Warden Darrel Vannoy, Louisiana State Penitentiary in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 06 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. | | | Jul 13 2022 | Reply of petitioner James S. Tyler, III filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 03 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|