Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1267
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1267
Title:Cisco Systems, Inc., Petitioner
v.
SRI International, Inc.
Docketed:March 18, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1685, 2020-1704)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 4, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 16 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 18, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Waiver of right of respondent SRI International, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of High Tech Inventors Alliance filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 18 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Comcast Corporation.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Comcast Corporation GRANTED.
May 16 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William F. Lee
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

William.Lee@wilmerhale.com
617 526 6000
Party name: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Frank Everett Scherkenbach
    Counsel of Record
Fish and Richardson, P.C.
One Marina Park Drive
Boston, MA 02110

scherkenbach@fr.com
617-521-7883
Party name: SRI International, Inc.
Other
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3667
Party name: Comcast Corporation
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: High Tech Inventors Alliance

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543