Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1249
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1249
Title:John E. Cassidy, Petitioner
v.
Massachusetts
Docketed:March 15, 2022
Lower Ct:Appeals Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(2020-P-0872)
   Decision Date:January 4, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 11, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 01 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 14, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Waiver of right of respondent Massachusetts to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 20 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John E. Cassidy15903 Cottage Ivy Circle
Tomball, TX 77377

(713) 425-9103
Party name: John Cassidy
Attorneys for Respondent
Anna E. Lumelsky
    Counsel of Record
Massachusetts Attorney General's Office
1 Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

anna.lumelsky@mass.gov
617-963-2334
Party name: Massachusetts

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543