SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-1090 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-1090 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
James Calvert, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:
February 7, 2022
Linked with 21A282
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
Case Numbers:
(WR-85,283-01)
Decision Date:
October 6, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2021
Application (21A282) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 4, 2021 to March 5, 2021, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Dec 30 2021
Application (21A282) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 3, 2022.
Feb 03 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2022)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 07 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 9, 2022 to April 8, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 08 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2022.
Apr 08 2022
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 22 2022
Reply of petitioner James Calvert filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 26 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marc Robert Shapiro
Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019
mrshapiro@orrick.com
212-506-3546
Party name: James Calvert
Attorneys for Respondent
Tomee Morgan Heining
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station
Austin, TX 78711
tomee.heining@oag.texas.gov
5124632148
Party name: State of Texas
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##