Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1030
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1030
Title:Peter Brimelow, Petitioner
v.
The New York Times Company
Docketed:January 21, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-66)
   Decision Date:October 21, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 22, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Waiver of right of respondent The New York Times Company to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022.
Feb 28 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Frederick Charles Kelly III
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Frederick C. Kelly, Esq.
One Harriman Square
Goshen, NY 10924

fckellylaw@protonmail.com
8452947945
Party name: Peter Brimelow
Attorneys for Respondent
Dana GreenThe New York Times Company, Legal Dept.
620 8th Avenue
New York, NY 10018

DANA.GREEN@NYTIMES.COM
212-556-5290
Party name: The New York Times Company

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543