Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-885
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-885
Title:Next Energy, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Illinois Department of Natural Resources
Docketed:January 4, 2021
Lower Ct:Appellate Court of Illinois, Fifth District
   Case Numbers:(5-18-0582)
   Decision Date:April 21, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 30, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2021Waiver of right of respondent Illinois Department of Natural Resources to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 19 2021Response Requested. (Due March 22, 2021)
Mar 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 22, 2021 to April 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 21, 2021.
Apr 21 2021Brief of respondent Illinois Department of Natural Resources in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 05 2021Reply of petitioner Next Energy, LLC filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
Jun 01 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rodney V. Taylor
    Counsel of Record
Christopher & Taylor
1219 North Delaware
Indianapolis, IN 46202-2530

rodtaylor@abatelegal.com
3176359000
Party name: Next Energy, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

jnotz@atg.state.il.us
312-814-5376
Party name: Illinois Department of Natural Resources

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543