Docket for 20-884
|
Dec 30 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 29 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2021 to April 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 01 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 5, 2021. | | | Apr 05 2021 | Brief of respondents County of San Mateo, et al., et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 21 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021. | | | May 17 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021. | | | May 24 2021 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of BP p.l.c. v. Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, 593 U. S. ___ (2021). Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | | Jun 25 2021 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|