SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-8444 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-8444 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Dustin Melvin Davison, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:
June 29, 2021
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
Case Numbers:
(D-2018-373)
Decision Date:
November 19, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
January 20, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 29, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Appendix
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jul 29 2021
Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 12 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrea Digilio Miller
Counsel of Record
800 N Harvey Ave.
Oklahoma City, OK 73102
admiller@okcu.edu
405-208-6161
Party name: Dustin Davison
Attorneys for Respondent
Ashley Lynn Willis
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Oklahoma
313 N.E. 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105
ashley.willis@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: Oklahoma
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##