SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-8312
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-8312
Title:
Ronald Delester Burke, Petitioner
v.
Washington
Docketed:
June 15, 2021
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Washington
Case Numbers:
(96783-1)
Decision Date:
January 14, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 09 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 15, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Appendix
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jul 14 2021
Waiver of right of respondent Washington to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 22 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Bruns Middaugh
Counsel of Record
Middaugh Law. PLLC
600 University Street, Suite 3020
Seattle, WA 98101
Mark@middaughlaw.com
2069194269
Party name: Ronald Burke
Attorneys for Respondent
Theodore Michael Cropley
Counsel of Record
Pierce County Prosecuting Attorney
930 Tacoma Avenue South
Room 946
Tacoma, WA 98402
theodore.cropley@piercecountywa.gov
2537986708
Party name: Washington
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##