SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-808 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-808 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Johnny Duane Miles, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:
December 15, 2020
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of California
Case Numbers:
(S086234)
Decision Date:
May 28, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
July 15, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 10 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2021)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 16 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 14, 2021 to February 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 17 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 16, 2021.
Jan 14 2021
Brief amici curiae of Former State and Federal Court Judges filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 16 2021
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2021
Reply of petitioner Johnny Duane Miles filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 03 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Clifford Gardner
Counsel of Record
Law Office of Cliff Gardner
1448 San Pablo Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94702
casetris@aol.com
(510) 524-1093
Party name: Johnny Duane Miles
Attorneys for Respondent
Seth Matthew Friedman
Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of the Attorney General
600 West Broadway
Suite 1800
San Diego, CA 92101
seth.friedman@doj.ca.gov
6197389157
Party name: California
Other
Debo P. Adegbile
Counsel of Record
Wilmer Hale Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007
Debo.Adegbile@wilmerhale.com
212-295-6717
Party name: Former State and Federal Court Judges
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##