SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-8048 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-8048 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
James Terry Colley, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
May 17, 2021
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC18-2014)
Decision Date:
November 25, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
January 12, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 12 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 16, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Proof of Service
Jun 16 2021
Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jul 01 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nancy Ryan
Counsel of Record
444 Seabreeze Blvd, Suite 210
Daytona Beach, FL 32114
ryan.nancy@pd7.org
386-254-3758
Party name: James Colley
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##